This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 00:23:10 (UTC).

CITY OF BRENTWOOD VS. VELEZ

Case Summary

On 10/07/2016 CITY OF BRENTWOOD filed a Civil Right - Firearm Right lawsuit against VELEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********1816

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Firearm Right

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CITY OF BRENTWOOD

Respondent

JOSE VELEZ

Brentwood, CA 94513

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

BROWER, DAMIEN

City Of Brentwood 150 City Park Way

Brentwood, CA 94513

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • ORDER RE PTN OF CITY OF BRENTWOOD GRANTED. WEAPONS SHALL BE CONFISCATED & DESTROYED PURS TO PC 18400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING ON: RETURN OF FIREARM SET BY JOSE VELEZ; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING WAS SET FOR 12/02/16 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION RE: RETURN OF FIREARM/DEADLY WEAPON FILED BY JOSE VELEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL OF PTN FOR DETERMINATION RE: FIREARMS ON JOSE VELEZ FILED; SERVED ON 10/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF/TO FILING PTN FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE: FIREARMS FILED BY CITY OF BRENTWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY CITY OF BRENTWOOD ISO PTN FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE: RETURN OF FIREARMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • DECLARATION OF OFFICER JOSHUA FLYNN FILED RE: ISO PTN FOR JUDICIAL DETERMINATION RE: RETURN OF FIREARMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • (U.J.) PETITION TO/FOR DETERMINATION RE: RETURN OF FIREARMS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 08

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWER, DAMIEN