This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/24/2021 at 04:03:02 (UTC).

CHICAGO TITLE VS WU

Case Summary

On 06/21/2021 CHICAGO TITLE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against WU. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0632

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY

Defendants

WENLI WU

RICHARD ALLEN COSTELLO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERSHORIN, LORI C

26475 Rancho Parkway South

Lake Forest, CA 92630

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2021
  • HearingDept: 36; Action text: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEPOSIT OF FUNDS IN INTERPLEADER ACTION & REQUEST FOR FUNDS TO BE PLACED IN AN INTEREST FIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSIGNED ORDER TO DEPOSIT FUNDS IN INTERPLEADER ACCO UNT W/COPY, SASE & CASE FILE SENT TO RM 103

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/25/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/21/2021 OF CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 11/05/21 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 36

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERSHORIN, LORI C.