This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 11:58:57 (UTC).

CHEN VS TURNER/COOKSEY

Case Summary

On 08/30/2016 CHEN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against TURNER/COOKSEY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0577

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HONG CHEN

San Ramon, CA 94582

Defendants

KIMBERLY TURNER

Antioch, CA 94531

XAVIER COOKSEY

Antioch, CA 94531

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHNIBBEN, ALLEN RAY

605 Eaker Way

Antioch, CA 94509

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 05/25/18 TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY FILED. RETURNED UN SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 05/25/18 TO SD COUNTY FILED. RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 05/25/18 TO SD COUNTY FILED. RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS FILED. PRO/PER SUBSTITUTES OUT ATTORNEY FOR HONG CHEN AND IS REPLACED BY ALLEN RAY SCHNIBBEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 09/07/17 TO ALAMEDA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED WHOLLY UN SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • SMALL CLAIMS WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN DIEGO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,258.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 12/13/16 TO ALA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED UN SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,125.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $12,125.60

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 10/17/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 08/30/2016 OF HONG CHEN AS TO XAVIER COOKSEY FILED. DATE OF MAILING 09/22/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $79.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 08/30/2016 OF HONG CHEN AS TO DEFENDANT KIMBERLY TURNER FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 09/22/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $79.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/14/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $10,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.