Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 13:00:19 (UTC).

CHAVARRIA VS WALNUT CREEK ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 CHAVARRIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WALNUT CREEK ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1022

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORA CHAVARRIA

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MUIR ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS

WALNUT CREEK ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES, LLC

Cross Defendants

ROES 1 THROUGH 50

MUIR ORTHODEDIC SPECIALIST

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REED, NIKOLAUS W

135 10Th St

San Francisco, CA 94103

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LU, TINA W

P.O. Box 64093

St. Paul, MN 55164

PETERSON, PATRICIA J

P.O.Box 64093

St.Paul, MN 94598

CLANCEY, CLFFORD A

15Th Floor At 801 Tower 801 South Figueroa St.

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT FILED BY MUIR ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT NIKOLAUS W. REED, PATRICIA L. PETERSON 08/08/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: RENOTICE OF MTN AND MOTION MAILED ON 08/07/19 TO SEE SERVICE LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • RENOTICE OF MTN AND MTN FOR ORDER GEN REF STAY AND APPT REF FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/11/2019 OF WALNUT CREEK ORTHOPEDIC ASSOCIATES, LLC FILED TO NAME MUIR ORTHODEDIC SPECIALIST AS DOE #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION WAS SET FOR 9/13/19 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY MUIR ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS IN APPT OF MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • DECLARATION OF PATRICIA J PETERSON FILED RE: ISO MTN FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2019
  • TRANSFERRED-IN COMPLAINT/PETITION TO/FOR PREMISES LIABILITY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • THE MAIN DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED IN THE TRANSFERRED RECORD ARE:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • CASE TRANSFERED IN FEES PREVIOUSLY PAID BY NORA CHAVARRIA (PLT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • STIPULATION & ORDER TO CHANGE VENUE FILED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DEFENDANT MUIR ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS ADDS ATTORNEY TINA W LU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/15/2019 OF NORA CHAVARRIA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • (U.J.) RECORD ON TRANSFER FROM ALAMEDA COUNTY/JURISDICTION FILED (PRIOR CASE NO. RG19005842); TRANSFER FEE RECEIVED FROM NORA CHAVARRIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MUIR ORTHOPAEDIC SPECIALISTS, A MEDICAL GRO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CLANCEY CLIFFORD A