This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:29:03 (UTC).

CHANDA HOWALD VS CHRISTIAN HOWALD

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 CHANDA HOWALD filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CHRISTIAN HOWALD. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2472

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Respondents and Not Classified By Court

CHANDA HOWALD

CHRISTIAN HOWALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Respondent and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

JONES, REBECCA J

239 Main Street Suite H

Pleasanton, CA 94566

MATEJCEK, MATTHEW T

1990 N. California Blvd 8Th Floor

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

LEWELLEN, KIM

1065 East Hillside Blvd Suite 308

Foster City, CA 94044

LEWELLEN, KIMBERLY E

1065 East Hillsdale Blvd, Ste, 310

Foster City, CA 94404

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR OTHER (VOC EVAL OF PETITIONER, IMPUTATION ( KIMBERLY E LEWELLEN)(ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • HEARING ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHANGE CUSTODY; VISITATION; AF & COSTS; OTHER ( MATTHEW T MATEJCEK)(ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF REQUEST FOR ORDER ON LAURA MATSIE, ESQ FILED; SERVED ON 07/16/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • HEARING ON MOTION/OSC WAS SET FOR 8/23/19 AT 10:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST FOR ORDERS (WITH CUSTODY/VISITATION) RE: CHANGE CUSTODY; VISIT; AF & COSTS; OTHER, FILED BY: CHANDA HOWALD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • NTC OF CHG OF ADD FOR ATTY KIMBERLY E LEWELLEN FIL ED

    Read MoreRead Less
84 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/30/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/30/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/26/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/26/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/30/2018 OF CHANDA HOWALD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/28/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 32

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.