This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/18/2017 at 10:53:15 (UTC).

CERVANTES VS KENNEALY/EVERRETT

Case Summary

On 07/11/2016 CERVANTES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KENNEALY/EVERRETT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0456

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMON NAVARRO CERVANTES

Anticoh, CA 94509

Defendants

JENNIFER THERESE EVERETT

Antioch, CA 94509

OLIVIA LOUISE KENNEALY

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • CIVIL SAD BEFORE HEARING - REQ. DISM. - NO ADR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 9/23/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 07/11/2016 OF RAMON CERVANTES AS TO DEFENDANT JENNIFER THERESE EVERETT. RETURNED LETTER IN CASE FILE. REASON NOT SERVED UNCLAIMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNSERVED ON THE CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 07/11/2016 OF RAMON CERVANTES AS TO DEFENDANT OLIVIA LOUISE KENNEALY. RETURNED LETTER IN CASE FILE. REASON NOT SERVED UNCLAIMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • --> CASE NUMBER CHANGED FROM PS/PS16-0456 TO PS/PSC16-0456.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 8/24/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 07/11/2016 OF RAMON CERVANTES SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: OLIVIA LOUISE KENNEALY, JENNIFER THERESE EVERETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $2,741.00

    Read MoreRead Less