This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 15:32:02 (UTC).

CERVANTES VS. HOME DEPOT

Case Summary

On 12/09/2016 CERVANTES filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2345

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARLOS CERVANTES

Defendant

HOME DEPOT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SEARS, ELIZABETH

638 Glen Oak Drive

Lodi, CA 95242

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 12/09/2016 OF CARLOS CERVANTES AS TO DEFENDANT HOME DEPOT WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HOME DEPOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR STRIKE FILED BY HOME DEPOT; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY HOME DEPOT U.S.A. INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HOME DEPOT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DECLARATION RE: LOCAL RULE 3.42 (3A) FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • REQUEST OF HOME DEPOT FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/07/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY HOME DEPOT ISO MTN TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DECLARATION OF STEPHEN TYE FILED RE: ISO MTN TO STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • MOTION TO STRIKE SECOND COUNT OF SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION COMPLAINT FILED 12/09/2016 OF CARLOS CERVANTES FILED BY HOME DEPOT, REPRESENTED BY STEPHEN M. TYE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/09/2016 OF CARLOS CERVANTES FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/28/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/14/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.