This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/21/2017 at 11:45:46 (UTC).

CELAMONTE HOMEOWNERS VS. CENTEX HOMES

Case Summary

On 02/03/2016 CELAMONTE HOMEOWNERS filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against CENTEX HOMES. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0189

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CELAMONTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

Defendants

CENTEX HOMES

CENTEX HOMES REAL ESTATE CORPORATION

SIGNAL HEATING AIRCONDITIONING & SHEET MET

D.H. SMITH COMPANY, INC.

TMI CONSTRUCTION, INC.

HERMSMEYER PAINTING COMPANY INCORPORATED

GONSALVES & SANTUCCI, INC.

CARY CONSTRUCTION

ENVIRONMENTS BY CHUCK, INC.

T&C ROOFING, INC.

ENVIRONMENTS BY CHURCH INC.

DARIDON INC.

CONCO CEMENT CO.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILL, JOHN P

1600 South Main Street Ste 215

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorneys

WILKINS, GABRIELLA A

1333 N. California Blvd Suite 600

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

BORUSZEWSKI, KELLY T

268 Bush Street, #2545

San Francisco, CA 94104

SMITH, DANIEL H

255 W. Julian Street Suite 402

San Jose, CA 95110

BOOTH, EILEEN T

2401 American River Dr Suite 100

Sacramento, CA 95825

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2016 OF CELAMONTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT DARIDON INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2016 OF CELAMONTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION AS TO DEFENDANT ENVIRONMENTS BY CHURCH INC. WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 4/07/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2016 OF CELAMONTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION PAID BY PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2016 OF CELAMONTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 4/08/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/21/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • FIRM/ATTORNEY JOHN P GILL UPDATED USING FIRM CODE JPG4 TO CORRECT STE #

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIGNAL HEATING AIR CONDITIONING & SHEET METAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Conco Cement Company is a litigant

Latest cases where CARY CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where D.H. SMITH COMPANY, INC. is a litigant