This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/16/2021 at 21:40:24 (UTC).

CCCERA VS SALGADO

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 CCCERA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SALGADO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0580

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONTRA COSTA COUNTY EMPLOYEES'RETIREMENT

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

MARTHA SALGADO

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

Cross Defendant

TRACEY NICKS

Oakland, CA 94612

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVY, KAREN G.

1355 Willow Way Suite 221

Concord, CA 94520

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

MALTZ, ROBERT M

Po Box 258829

Oklahoma City, OK 73125-8829

Cross Defendant Attorney

GOINS, VERNON C.

1970 Broadway Suite 260

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: WHY THE CROSS COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FO FAILURE TO DISPOSITION AFTER SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCOPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketRESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FILED BY MARTHA SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCHECK FOR NTC OF SETTLEMENT/DISMISSAL; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY MARTHA SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • DocketDISMISSAL FILED/ENTERED ON THE COMPLAINT OF CCC EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT ASSOC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS/PHONE NUMBER OF ATTORNEY FIRM LAW OFFICES OF VERNON C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • DocketFURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAM-ABREGO, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: MARTHA SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Docket(U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2019 OF CONTRA COSTA COUNTYEMPLOYEES'RETIREMENT FILED BY MARTHA SALGADO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketCHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 03/26/2019 OF CONTRA COSTA COUNTYEMPLOYEES'RETIREMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GRAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 8/28/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 5/30/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRA COSTA COMMUNITY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOINS II, VERNON C.