This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 16:55:19 (UTC).

CAVENDER VS. WELLS FARGO

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 CAVENDER filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WELLS FARGO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0858

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PAMELA J CAVENDER

MARK A CAVENDER

Defendants

QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SMART, DAVID L

Smart Law Offices 8880 Cal Center Dr. #400

Sacramento, CA 95826

WHITE, JAMIL L

1851 Heritage Lane Suite 148

Sacramento, CA 95815

Defendant Attorney

LONERGAN, MARK D

One Embarcadero Ctr #2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR DEFENDANT BEFORE TRIAL ON 11/07/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • ** VOID ** GC 70627(A) COPY/COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • CHECK FOR DISPOSITION AFTER SUMMARY JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • CHECK FOR POS RE: QUALITY LOAN/DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • NOTICE OF/TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • ORDER SUSTAINING DEFT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.S DEMURRER TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • TO 103 - ORDER SUSTAINING DEMURRER

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 7/14/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2017 OF MARK CAVENDER AS TO QUALITY LOAN SERVICE CORPORATION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2017 OF MARK CAVENDER AS TO WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/05/2017 OF MARK CAVENDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 7/10/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/22/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.