This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 11/29/2023 at 13:30:00 (UTC).

STEVIE HAYES vs. BLUE APRON, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/11/2023 STEVIE HAYES filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BLUE APRON, LLC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Treat, Charles S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2278

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Treat, Charles S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HAYES, STEVIE

Defendants and Respondents

BLUE APRON, LLC

DOES 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

CAMPBELL, JESSICA L

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BRONCHETTI, ELLEN M.

 

Court Documents

Initial Complaint Filed

09/11/2023: Initial Complaint Filed

Original Summons Issued/Filed

09/11/2023: Original Summons Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

09/11/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

CMC Notice - Fast Track

01/23/2024: CMC Notice - Fast Track

POS of Summons on Blue Apron

10/02/2023: POS of Summons on Blue Apron

Answer of Blue Apron Pltfs Complaint

10/19/2023: Answer of Blue Apron Pltfs Complaint

 

Docket Entries

01/23/2024
View Court Documents

Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Judicial Officer: Treat, Charles S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer/Response/Denial - Unlimited; Answer of Blue Apron Pltfs Complaint; Comment: of Blue Apron Pltfs Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/19/2023

DocketNotes; Comment: Answer of Blue Apron Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons; POS of Summons on Blue Apron; Comment: on Blue Apron

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: HAYES, STEVIE; Served: 09/19/2023; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons Issued/Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInitial Complaint Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023

DocketFee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less