This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 11/25/2023 at 23:26:48 (UTC).

Safeamerica Credit Union vs. Kamilah Zeno

Case Summary

On 07/19/2023 Safeamerica Credit Union filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Kamilah Zeno. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fannin, Jill C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1750

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fannin, Jill C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Safeamerica Credit Union

Defendants and Respondents

Zeno, Kamilah

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FERNS, BARRY W.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Continuance

03/26/2024: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession

11/08/2023: Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of/to: Tentative Ruling Program

09/14/2023: Notice of/to: Tentative Ruling Program

Declaration Filed Re: ISO Application for Writ of Possession

09/14/2023: Declaration Filed Re: ISO Application for Writ of Possession

Application For Writ of Possession after hearing

09/14/2023: Application For Writ of Possession after hearing

Notice of/to: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

09/14/2023: Notice of/to: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession

09/11/2023: Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession

Verification on First Amended Complaint

08/22/2023: Verification on First Amended Complaint

Summons On First Amended Complaint

08/22/2023: Summons On First Amended Complaint

First Amended Complaint Filed

08/22/2023: First Amended Complaint Filed

Notice of Tentative Ruling Program

08/03/2023: Notice of Tentative Ruling Program

Verification of Complaint

08/03/2023: Verification of Complaint

Dec ISO Application for Writ of Possession

08/03/2023: Dec ISO Application for Writ of Possession

Notice of/to: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

08/03/2023: Notice of/to: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

Application for Writ of Possession

08/03/2023: Application for Writ of Possession

CMC Notice - Fast Track

01/12/2024: CMC Notice - Fast Track

Summons Issued/Filed

07/19/2023: Summons Issued/Filed

Declaration In Support of Venue

07/19/2023: Declaration In Support of Venue

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

11/15/2023

DocketHearing in Re:; Judicial Officer: Fannin, Jill C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Application for writ of possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of/to:; Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketHearing in Re:; Judicial Officer: Fannin, Jill C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Application for writ of possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of/to:; Notice of/to: Tentative Ruling Program; Comment: Tentative Ruling Program

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Re:; Declaration Filed Re: ISO Application for Writ of Possession; Comment: ISO Application for Writ of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketApplication Filed To/For:; Application For Writ of Possession after hearing; Comment: Writ of Possession after hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of/to:; Notice of/to: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing; Comment: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of/to:; Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession; Comment: Notice of Withdrawal of Application for Writ of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketService of Amended Complaint; Requested By: Safeamerica Credit Union; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Filing Re:; Verification on First Amended Complaint; Comment: Verification on First Amended Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketMiscellaneous Filing Re:; Verification of Complaint; Comment: Verification of Complaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of; Dec ISO Application for Writ of Possession; Comment: ISO Application for Writ of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of/to:; Notice of/to: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing; Comment: Application for Writ of Possession and Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

DocketApplication Filed To/For:; Application for Writ of Possession; Comment: Writ of Possession

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketService of Petition and/or Summons; Requested By: Safeamerica Credit Union; Unserved

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued/Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of; Declaration In Support of Venue; Comment: Declaration In Support of Venue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023
View Court Documents

Docket*Initial Petition Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2023

DocketFee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less