This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/04/2023 at 00:06:46 (UTC).

Gilbert Rodarte vs. Kenneth Moore

Case Summary

On 05/25/2023 Gilbert Rodarte filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Kenneth Moore. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fannin, Jill C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1258

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fannin, Jill C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Rodarte, Gilbert Lee

Respondents and Defendants

Moore, Kenneth Allen

DOES 1 TO 20, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

EISON, OWILI K

 

Court Documents

Initial Complaint Filed

05/25/2023: Initial Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/25/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Original Summons Issued Filed

05/25/2023: Original Summons Issued Filed

CMC Notice - Fast Track

09/26/2023: CMC Notice - Fast Track

Notice of Continuance

11/14/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

11/14/2023: Notice of Continuance

Notice of Continuance

11/14/2023: Notice of Continuance

Proof of Service of Summons to Kenneth Allen Moore

06/20/2023: Proof of Service of Summons to Kenneth Allen Moore

Motion to be relieved as counsel

07/07/2023: Motion to be relieved as counsel

Dec ISO motion to be relieved as counsel

07/07/2023: Dec ISO motion to be relieved as counsel

Proposed order granting motion to be relieved as counsel

07/07/2023: Proposed order granting motion to be relieved as counsel

Proof of Service by Mail Re motion to be relieved as counsel

07/07/2023: Proof of Service by Mail Re motion to be relieved as counsel

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Notice of Continuance; Notice of Continuance; Notice of Continuance; Judicial Officer: Fannin, Jill C; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2023
  • Docket*Hearing on Motion in Re:; Judicial Officer: Fannin, Jill C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: To be relieved as counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Proof of Service by Mail Re motion to be relieved as counsel; Comment: Re motion to be relieved as counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLodge Order/Judgment; Proposed order granting motion to be relieved as counsel; Comment: Proposed order granting motion to be relieved as counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration Re:; Dec ISO motion to be relieved as counsel; Comment: ISO motion to be relieved as counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Filed To/For; Motion to be relieved as counsel; Comment: Be relieved as counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Proof of Service of Summons to Kenneth Allen Moore; Comment: Personal service on 06/12/23 to Kenneth Allen Moore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Rodarte, Gilbert Lee, Moore, Kenneth Allen; Served: 06/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons Issued/Filed; Original Summons Issued Filed; Comment: Original Summons Issued Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2023
  • DocketFee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less