This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/03/2023 at 05:06:00 (UTC).

Conservatorship of: Frances P Bowles

Case Summary

On 05/22/2023 Conservatorship of Frances P Bowles was filed as a Probate - Conservatorship lawsuit. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judges overseeing this case are George, Virginia M, Schmuck, Mark and George, Virginia M. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0905

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Conservatorship

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judges

George, Virginia M, Schmuck, Mark

George, Virginia M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Nesbitt, Elizabeth

Conservatee

Bowles, Frances P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

BLAKE, EMILY

Conservatee Attorney

LAMAY, MICHAEL I

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketLetters of Conservatorship Issued; Comment: Person & estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2023
  • DocketSurety Bond Posted From:; Comment: Platte River Insurance Company ($972,000.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketOrder Filed Re:; Comment: That the Conservatee's Estate be Assessed for the Court Investigator's Services

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Conservator; Comment: BOND is fixed at $972,000.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketProbate Confidential Report of Court Investigator Filed; Comment: Medical and CLETS Information Addendum to the Court Investigator's Report

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketProbate Confidential Report of Court Investigator Filed; Comment: Report of the Court Investigator prior to Appointment pursuant to Section 1826

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2023
  • DocketNotes; Comment: Signed Order appointing conservator sent to clerk's office for filing.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • DocketHearing in Re:; Judicial Officer(s): George, Virginia M, Schmuck, Mark; Hearing Time: 9:01 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Petition for appointment of conservator of the person & esate filed on 05/22/23 by Elizabeth Nesbitt

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2023
  • DocketDeclaration of; Comment: Dec re: tentative ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2023
  • DocketLodge Order/Judgment; Comment: Proposed order appointing conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketDuties of Conservator Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketSurety Bond Posted From:; Comment: Platte River Insurance Company ($972,000.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketConfidential Supplemental Information

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketConfidential Screening Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketMiscellaneous Filing Re:; Comment: Letter from Kaiser Permanente re: Frances Bowles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Hearing Re:; Comment: Petition for appointment of temporary conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketProof of Service; Comment: Personal service re petition for appointment of temp conservator on 05/16/23

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketOrder Appointing Temporary Conservator

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketPetition to Appoint Temporary Conservator - Person & Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2023
  • DocketPetition for Appointment of Conservator - Person & Estate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less