This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 09/28/2023 at 02:03:53 (UTC).

NATASHA WINDOM vs. SKSS ENTERPRISES INC.

Case Summary

On 05/26/2023 NATASHA WINDOM filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against SKSS ENTERPRISES INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Treat, Charles S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1274

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Treat, Charles S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

WINDOM, NATASHA

Respondents and Defendants

SKSS ENTERPRISES INC.

DOES 1 THROUGH 10, INCLUSIVE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

MARQUEZ, JUSTIN F

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Litman, David G

 

Court Documents

Initial Complaint Filed

05/26/2023: Initial Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

05/26/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons Issued/Filed

05/26/2023: Summons Issued/Filed

CMC Notice - Complex

09/25/2023: CMC Notice - Complex

Proof of Service of Summons on SKSS Enterprises Inc.

07/14/2023: Proof of Service of Summons on SKSS Enterprises Inc.

Answer/Response/Denial of SKSS Enterprises, Inc to Complaint of Windom

08/23/2023: Answer/Response/Denial of SKSS Enterprises, Inc to Complaint of Windom

Case Management Conference Statement Filed by SKSS Enterprises, Inc. dba The UPS Store

09/08/2023: Case Management Conference Statement Filed by SKSS Enterprises, Inc. dba The UPS Store

Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Natasha Windom

09/19/2023: Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Natasha Windom

Minutes

09/25/2023: Minutes

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2024
  • Docket*Further Case Management Conference; Judicial Officer: Treat, Charles S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Complex; Minutes; Judicial Officer: Treat, Charles S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement Filed; Case Management Conference Statement Filed by Natasha Windom; Comment: by Natasha Windom

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement Filed; Case Management Conference Statement Filed by SKSS Enterprises, Inc. dba The UPS Store; Comment: Case Management Conference Statement Filed by SKSS Enterprises, Inc. dba The UPS Store

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • DocketNotes; Comment: Answer of SKSS Enterprises Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer/Response/Denial - Unlimited; Answer/Response/Denial of SKSS Enterprises, Inc to Complaint of Windom; Comment: of SKSS Enterprises, Inc to Complaint of Windom

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Proof of Service of Summons on SKSS Enterprises Inc.; Comment: on SKSS Enterprises Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: WINDOM, NATASHA; Served: 07/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2023
  • DocketFee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less