This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 11/27/2023 at 13:21:30 (UTC).

Pawnee Leasing Corporation vs. Felipe Fuentes

Case Summary

On 08/14/2023 Pawnee Leasing Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Felipe Fuentes. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Treat, Charles S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4341

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judge

Treat, Charles S

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Pawnee Leasing Corporation

Respondents and Defendants

Fuentes, Felipe Antonio Ramos

Ramos Trucking LLC

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

FERNS, BARRY W.

 

Court Documents

Initial Complaint Filed

08/14/2023: Initial Complaint Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/14/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Dec ISO Venue

08/14/2023: Dec ISO Venue

Summons Issued/Filed

08/14/2023: Summons Issued/Filed

CMC Notice - Fast Track

01/08/2024: CMC Notice - Fast Track

Proof of Service of Summons as to Ramos Trucking LLC on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV

09/27/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to Ramos Trucking LLC on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV

Proof of Service of Summons as to Felipe Ramos on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV

09/27/2023: Proof of Service of Summons as to Felipe Ramos on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV

 

Docket Entries

01/08/2024
View Court Documents

Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Judicial Officer: Treat, Charles S; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Proof of Service of Summons as to Felipe Ramos on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV; Comment: as to Felipe Ramos on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/27/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons; Proof of Service of Summons as to Ramos Trucking LLC on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV; Comment: as to Ramos Trucking LLC on 9/16/23 by PERS SERV

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Pawnee Leasing Corporation; Served: 09/16/2023; Unserved; Served: 09/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued/Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of; Dec ISO Venue; Comment: Dec ISO Venue

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketInitial Complaint Filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2023

DocketFee Paid

[+] Read More [-] Read Less