This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 08:36:10 (UTC).

CANADY VS BIG LOTS

Case Summary

On 08/03/2016 CANADY filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BIG LOTS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0526

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANA CANADY

Antioch, CA 94509

Defendant

BIG LOTS STORES INC

2710 Gateway Oaks Dr Ste 150N

Sacramento, CA 94833

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 10/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 10/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 08/03/2016 OF DANA CANADY FOR DEFENDANT BIG LOTS STORES INC. DATE OF SERVICE 08/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • COPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 08/03/2016 OF DANA CANADY SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: BIG LOTS STORES INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 10/19/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2016
  • CASE RESET FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 9/21/16 AT 8:45 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY DANA CANADY (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO DANA CANADY IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less