This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 12:15:18 (UTC).

BROWN VS WALMART

Case Summary

On 12/11/2015 BROWN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WALMART. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0644

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MELINDA BROWN

Richmond, CA 94804

Defendant

WALMART

1400 Hilltop Mall Rd

Richmond, CA 94806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS SAD BEFORE HEARING - ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2015
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 12/11/2015 OF MELINDA BROWN AS TO WALMART FILED. DATE OF MAILING 12/14/15. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MELINDA BROWN (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO MELINDA BROWN IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 1/13/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $650.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant