This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 00:38:46 (UTC).

BROWN V HOBBS

Case Summary

On 09/01/2016 BROWN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HOBBS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0733

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAROLYN BROWN

Defendants

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

CHESTER MANN HOBBS

Berkeley, CA 94703

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CLEMENTS, DENZIL E

3150 Hilltop Mall Dr #35

Richmond, CA 94806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2016
  • RETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF TRIAL SENT TO HOBBS RETURNED ATTEMPTED - UNABLE TO FORWARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2016
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED - CONTESTED COURT TRIAL ON 11/06/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF JUDGMENT SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2016
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2016 OF CAROLYN BROWN AGAINST DEFENDANT ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY POSTING ON DEFENDANT CHESTER MANN HOBBS FILED WITH A MAILING DATE OF 09/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 09/16/16

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO CHESTER MANN HOBBS IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2016 OF CAROLYN BROWN FILED BY CHESTER MANN HOBBS REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY CHESTER MANN HOBBS (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2016
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • HEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 10/18/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 09/01/2016 OF CAROLYN BROWN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less