This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/29/2019 at 11:55:20 (UTC).

BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS VS COOPER/HILL

Case Summary

On 03/20/2014 BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against COOPER/HILL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0309

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLC

Defendants

TRACY COOPER

San Pablo, CA 94806

DWIGHT HILL

UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NAGY, EDWARD A.

510 3Rd Street Suite 101

Oakland, CA 94607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINERS NOT DISPOSITIONED OR IN THE COURT CONTROL WITH IN 45 DAYS; Disposition: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2014
  • DocketRETURNED WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • DocketCLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF ORDER TO SET ASIDE SENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2014
  • DocketHEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE JUDGMENT FILED BY TRACY COOPER; Disposition: Denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketOPPOSITION TO MOTION TO/FOR SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED BY BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • DocketCLERK KCHAN NOTIFIED SHERIFF RE: NO MONIES PAID

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANT NOTIFIED RE: STAY GRANTED AND CONDITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketDEFENDANTS ATTORNEY (NUMBER PROVIDED ON APPLICATI ONS) NOTIFIED RE: STAY GRANTED AND CONDITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2014
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS ATTORNEY NOTIFIED RE: STAY GRANTED AND CONDITIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/09/2014
  • DocketSUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2014 OF BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLC AS TO DEFENDANT TRACY COOPER WITH MAILING DATE OF 03/23/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2014 OF BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2014 OF BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLC AGAINST DEFENDANT UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketUNNAMED OCCUPANTS ADDED AS A PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2014
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FOR PRE-JUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION ON 03/20/14

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR DISPOSITION DATE ON 5/06/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 2CLK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 03/20/2014 OF BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS, LLC FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BROOKSIDE APARTMENTS is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NAGY, EDWARD A.