This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/26/2019 at 08:17:52 (UTC).

BROADWAY MANAGEMENT VS. WAGNER

Case Summary

On 12/28/2010 BROADWAY MANAGEMENT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WAGNER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1007

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BROADWAY MANAGEMENT COMPANY

Defendant

SUNG CHO WAGNER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTHBARD, TODD

4261 Norwalk Drive #107

San Jose, CA 95129

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA RETURNED FULLY-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2011
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • NOTIFIED CCSO (MSG ON V/M) @ 10:15 DEF DIDNT PAY RENT MONIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • WAIVER ORDER & PETITION FOR STAY ORDER SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • NOTIFIED CCSO @ 10:45 (MARGO) & ATTYS (ANGELA) @ 10:47-APPROVES AS LONG AS RENT MONIES ARE PAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY SUNG CHO WAGNER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • ORDER TO/FOR STAY OF EXECUTION IS GRANTED FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • ON CONDITION THAT $520 IS POSTED W/CLKS OFFICE NO LATER THAN 2PM ON 1/14/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • ORDER FILED ON WAIVER OF FEES AS TO SUNG CHO WAGNER IS GRANTED.; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2011
  • PETITION FOR STAY & WAIVER SUBMITTED TO COMMISSIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/06/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 01/06/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2010 OF BROADWAY MANAGEMENTCOMPANY FILED AS TO DEFENDANT SUNG CHO WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2010 OF BROADWAY MANAGEMENTCOMPANY AGAINST DEFENDANT SUNG CHO WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2010 OF BROADWAY MANAGEMENTCOMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2010 OF BROADWAY MANAGEMENTCOMPANY AS TO DEF ENDANT SUNG CHO WAGNER WITH SERVICE DATE OF 12/31/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 2/16/11 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 12/28/2010 OF BROADWAY MANAGEMENTCOMPANY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rothbard, Todd B.