This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/22/2017 at 16:23:38 (UTC).

BRAVO VS. SMITH

Case Summary

On 12/20/2016 BRAVO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2418

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

OFELIA BRAVO

FELIX BRAVO

Defendant

BRIAN G SMITH

Other

IRVING BRAVO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Other Attorney

TSAGARIS, CONSTANTINE P

411 Borel Ave #501

San Mateo, CA 94402

Defendant Attorney

MILLER, KURT D.

1800 Sutter Street Suite 260

Concord, CA 94520

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2017
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: ONE HOUR DELIVERY SERVICE, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: BRIAN G SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2016 OF FELIX BRAVO FILED BY BRIAN G SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 6/29/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2016 OF FELIX BRAVO AS TO BRIAN G SMITH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: CONTINUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS CASE FOR FAILURE TO SERVE AND PROSECUTE; Disposition: DISCHARGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • DECLARATION OF CONSTANTINE TSAGARIS FILED RE: IN RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF HEARING ON OSC RE WHY THE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2016 OF FELIX BRAVO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED 12/20/2016 OF FELIX BRAVO AS TO PLAINTIFF IRVING BRAVO, FELIX BRAVO ADDED AS AN INDIVIDUAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • PETITION/DECLARATION TO APPOINT A GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR IRVING BRAVO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • ORDER APPOINTING FELIX BRAVO GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR IRVING BRAVO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 5/09/17 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 2/23/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.