This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/11/2019 at 12:30:29 (UTC).

BRADFORD VS MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 BRADFORD filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0697

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTER BRADFORD

Defendants

JEFF ANDERSON

MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC

BAY AREA NEWS GROUP EAST BAY LLC

JEFF ANDERSON & ASSOCIATES PA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRANDI, THOMAS J

44 Montgomery St #1050

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2019 OF WALTER BRADFORD AS TO MEDIANEWS GROUP, INC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 5/24/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2019 OF WALTER BRADFORD AS TO BAY AREA NEWS GROUPEAST BAY LLC WITH SERVICE DATE OF 04/05/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/03/2019 OF WALTER BRADFORD FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 6/07/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 8/20/19 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MediaNews Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bay Area News Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDI, THOMAS J.