Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 07:59:33 (UTC).

BOSTIC VS. GIVENS

Case Summary

On 02/16/2012 BOSTIC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GIVENS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0138

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICOLE R. BOSTIC

Defendant

MICHAEL GIVENS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE, ELAINE R.

405 14Th St., #1011

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) RETURNED FULLY-SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2012
  • CLERK`S CALENDAR - FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA (WRIT OF POSSESSION) COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES ONLY ON 03/15/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2012 OF NICOLE BOSTIC FILED AS TO DEFENDANT MICHAEL GIVENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON THE UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2012 OF NICOLE BOSTIC AGAINST DEFENDANT MICHAEL GIVENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2012 OF NICOLE BOSTIC AS TO DEF ENDANT MICHAEL GIVENS WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2012
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED AS TO ALL REMAINING DOES ON THE COMPLAINT OF UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2012 OF NICOLE BOSTIC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • HEARING ON FAILURE TO DISPOSITION UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT WAS SET FOR 4/04/12 AT 17:00 IN DEPT. 3CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 02/16/2012 OF NICOLE BOSTIC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UNDER $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less