This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 22:33:16 (UTC).

BORST VS ENTWISTLE

Case Summary

On 06/13/2012 BORST filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ENTWISTLE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0341

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KELLYN BORST

Pacheco, CA 94553

Defendant

BRITTANY ENTWISTLE

Pacheco, CA 94553

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2016
  • RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 12/20/12 TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $1,266.39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,047.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $17.48

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $155.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • MEMO OF COSTS ACCRUED MAILED ON 10/23/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 08/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 06/13/2012 OF KELLYN BORST AS TO DEFENDANT BRITTANY ENTWISTLE FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 06/18/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $70.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/19/12 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM - $1,160.00

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.