This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 15:11:17 (UTC).

BLACK DIAMOND VS NORTHER CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 BLACK DIAMOND filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against NORTHER CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1816

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRIC, INC

Defendants and Respondents

ANDRE GARDNER

DAVID VINCENT

NORTHERN CALIFORNIA ELECTRICALCONSTRUCTION

PATRICK WIRSING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

BIRKA-WHITE, DAVID M

178 E. Prospect Ave.

Danville, CA 94526

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

BURKE, MICHAEL S

456 Montgomery St, 20Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • REMITTITUR FROM DCA - EACH PARTY TO BEAR THEIR OW N COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • ABANDONMENT OF APPEAL FROM BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRIC, INC. FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • WE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR STIPULATION AND PPD ORDER TO ABANDON APPEAL FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • DESIGNATION OF APPELLANT (8.122) & WITH REPORTER TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL BY BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRICAL CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR PREPARATION OF CLERKS TX/CERTIFICATION FROM BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRIC, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • CERTIFIED COPY/COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR PREPARATION OF CLERKS TX/CERTIFICATION FROM NORTHERN CALIFORNIAELECTRICALCONSTRUCTION, ANDRE GARDNER, DAVID VINCENT, PATRICK WIRSING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR COURT FEE PURSUANT TO GC 68926.1 FROM BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRIC, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 09/19/2017 OF BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRIC, INC AS TO DAVID VINCENT WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 09/25/17 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 11/30/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/19/2017 OF BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRIC, INC AS TO NORTHERN CALIFORNIAELECTRICALCONSTRUCTION WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/25/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 09/19/2017 OF BLACK DIAMOND ELECTRIC, INC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 2/02/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/27/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 39

    Read MoreRead Less