This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 04:42:03 (UTC).

BHULLAR V HESTER

Case Summary

On 06/23/2016 BHULLAR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HESTER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0308

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHANIE A. BHULLAR

Oakland, CA 94612

Defendants

STEPHANIE HESTER

Antioch, CA 94531

MIKE HESTER

Antioch, CA 94531

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT SENT TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/29/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/23/2016 OF STEPHANIE BHULLAR AS TO DEFENDANT MIKE HESTER FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 07/11/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/23/2016 OF STEPHANIE BHULLAR AS TO DEFENDANT STEPHANIE HESTER FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 07/05/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY STEPHANIE A. BHULLAR (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO STEPHANIE A. BHULLAR IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $3,990.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/27/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less