This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 10/27/2022 at 13:44:09 (UTC).

Beverly Minor vs. Gabriela Saucedo

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 Beverly Minor filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Gabriela Saucedo. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Devine, John P and Castellanos, Cecilia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1353

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

Judge Details

Judges

Devine, John P

Castellanos, Cecilia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Minor, Beverly

Defendants and Respondents

Saucedo, Gabriela

DOES 1 TO 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Samaan, Nabil

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

WALSH, CATHERINE A

 

Court Documents

Initial Complaint Filed

06/22/2022: Initial Complaint Filed

Summons Issued/Filed

06/22/2022: Summons Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

06/22/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited

08/16/2022: Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited

Demand for Jury Trial Filed

08/16/2022: Demand for Jury Trial Filed

Case Management Conference Statement Filed

10/18/2022: Case Management Conference Statement Filed

CMC Notice - Fast Track

11/02/2022: CMC Notice - Fast Track

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket*Case Management Conference; CMC Notice - Fast Track; Judicial Officer: Castellanos, Cecilia; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Conference Statement Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketNotes; Comment: Answer e-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Demand for Jury Trial Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer/Response/Denial - Unlimited

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • Cause Of ActionComplaint; Type: Action; Description: Initial Complaint Filed 06/22/22; Remedy: Monetary Damages; Amount: $0.0

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketCause Of Action; Action Complaint; File Date: 06/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketService of Complaint and Summons; Requested By: Minor, Beverly; Unserved; Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketFee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInitial Complaint Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WALSH, CATHERINE A.