This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 13:54:43 (UTC).

BESS V BURLEY

Case Summary

On 06/20/2016 BESS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BURLEY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0305

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA BESS

Pinole, CA 94564

Defendant

REGINA BURLEY

Pinole, CA 94564

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS SAD BEFORE HEARING - ENTRY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2016
  • ORDER TO/FOR TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS ACTION WITH PREJUDI CE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • STIPULATION & ORDER VACATE JUDGMENT AND DISMISS ACTION; ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/20/2016 OF LINDA BESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/22/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS REFERAL TO MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2016
  • ORDER TO/FOR POSTPONE TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/20/2016 OF LINDA BESS AS TO DEFENDANT REGINA BURLEY FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 06/21/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE FILED BY REGINA BURLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/25/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less