This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 04:40:46 (UTC).

BERROTERAN VS AIRFAIR.COM

Case Summary

On 06/05/2015 BERROTERAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AIRFAIR COM. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0293

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARLENE GARCIA BERROTERAN

Richmond, CA 94801

MIRNA MARQUEZ BERROTERAN

Richmond, CA 94801

Defendant

AIRFAIR.COM

193 Barrett Ave.

Richmond, CA 94801

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2015
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,860.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • DocketRETURNED MAIL: ATTEMPTED- NOT KNOWN; UNABLE TO FORWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/05/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 08/05/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 07/22/15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2015
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE RECEIVED FROM DEFT., AIRFARE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/05/2015 OF MARLENE BERROTERAN AS TO DEFENDANT AIRFAIR.COM, WITH SERVICE DATE OF 06/17/15 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/22/15 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketCOPY OF SMALL CLAIMS CLAIM AND ORDER ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 06/05/2015 OF MARLENE BERROTERAN SENT CERTIFIED MAIL BY CLERK THIS DATE TO: AIRFAIR.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketAMOUNT OF CLAIM $3,120.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2015
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $1,500.00, UP TO $5,000.00)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less