Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 18:56:51 (UTC).

BERDING VS WASSELL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 BERDING filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WASSELL. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5711

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERDING & WEIL LLP

Defendant

DARREN WASSELL

Danville, CA 94506

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SOSKIN, PETER E

2175 N Californa Blvd, Ste 500

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2016
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL ON CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2016
  • JURY TRIAL - SHORT CAUSE/ 2 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • NOTICE OF CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF BERDING & WEIL LLP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • CLERKS TICKLER FOR DISMISSAL WAS SET FOR 8/11/16 AT 7:00 ON 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY BERDING & WEIL LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2012
  • (L.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF BERDING & WEIL LLP FILED BY DARREN WASSELL REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF BERDING & WEIL LLP AS TO DARREN WASSELL WITH SERVICE DATE OF 09/03/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 10/22/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF BERDING & WEIL LLP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/29/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/10/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less