This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/19/2017 at 19:59:02 (UTC).

BELLECI VS. CARE CENTER OF ROSSMOOR

Case Summary

On 06/11/2015 BELLECI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CARE CENTER OF ROSSMOOR. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1034

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FRANK BELLECI

SYLVIA BELLECI

Defendants

CARE CENTER OF ROSSMOOR, LLC

CALIFORNIA NURSINGCENTERS, LLC

KINDRED HEALTHCARE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSE, STEFFI A

5001 Airport Plaza Drive Suite 210

Long Beach, CA 90815

Defendant Attorney

FEUSNER, JODIE

2330 Marinship Way Suite 250

Sausalito, CA 94965

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: FAILURE TO FILE DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2016
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC WAS SET FOR 8/08/16 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 10 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2016
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL AFTER UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: OSC ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED BY FRANK BELLECI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • CASE REMOVED FROM COURT`S CONTROL DUE TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT HAVING BEEN FILED/ENTERED INTO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER WAS SET FOR 2/17/16 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 21

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2015
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 06/11/2015 OF FRANK BELLECI FILED BY CARE CENTER OF ROSSMOOR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 06/11/2015 OF FRANK BELLECI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PURPLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFFS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • ADVANCED NON-REFUNDABLE JURY FEE PAID BY: LANZONE MORGAN LLP, ON BEHALF OF PARTY: FRANK BELLECI, SYLVIA BELLECI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 10/28/15 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 8/17/15 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2015
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 21

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CARE CENTER OF ROSSMOOR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDRED HEALTHCARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FEUSNER, JODIE C.