This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 12/26/2016 at 21:13:26 (UTC).

BEG RED VS SWISHER

Case Summary

On 10/06/2009 BEG RED filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SWISHER. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0792

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BIG RED CONSTRUCTION

946 Hough Avenue

Lafayette, CA 94549

Defendant

CLIFF SWISHER

Walnut Creek, CA 94595

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2013
  • CERTIFIED COPY/COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • DECLARATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR FILED RE: SATISFACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 10/06/2009 OF BIG RED CONSTRUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2010
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/07/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/07/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 12/03/09 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 12/03/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 10/06/2009 OF BIG RED CONSTRUCTION AS TO CLIFF SWISHER FILED. DATE OF MAILING 10/14/09. FEE FOR SERVICE $89.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/03/09 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • COLOR OF FILE IS MANILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM UP TO $1,500.00)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $1,045.93

    Read MoreRead Less