Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 11:36:52 (UTC).

BECKMAN VS DEGREGORIO

Case Summary

On 05/31/2012 BECKMAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEGREGORIO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0145

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

NANCY A. BECKMAN

Vacaville, CA 95687

Defendant and Appellant

CORY DEGREGORIO

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

ARTEAGA, THORSTEN

540 Lennon Lane

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2015
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 09/26/12 TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2012
  • HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2012
  • COPY OF PROOF OF MAILING FROM PLAINTIFF; LODGED ON Y, PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2012
  • ORIGINAL CLAIM OF EXEMPTION & OPPOSITION FILED WITH COPY OF NOTICE OF HEARING (RECEIVED FROM SO) AS TO DEFENDANT NANCY A. BECKMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • SPECIAL SET HEARING WAS SET FOR 12/14/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED WITHCOPY OF NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2012
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO CONTRA COSTA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $6,838.50; Disposition: WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO SENT TO THE FOLLOWING PARTIES:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT ENTERED ON 09/07/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2012
  • JUDGEMENT ENTERED ON 04/18/12 SET ASIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2012
  • CAUSE HAVING BEEN CALLED FOR HEARING/TRIAL ON 04/18/12 THE COURT NOW MAKES THE FOLLOWING RULING:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/18/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 02/14/2012 OF NANCY BECKMAN AS TO DEFENDANT CORY DEGREGORIO FILED. DATE OF SERVICE 03/20/12. FEE FOR SERVICE $88.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS BLUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 4/18/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $6,700.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less