This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:26:00 (UTC).

BEATRICE M. NEMIROFSKY VS FRANK NEMIROFSKY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 BEATRICE M NEMIROFSKY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against FRANK NEMIROFSKY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0799

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

BEATRICE MARIE NEMIROFSKY

Respondent

FRANK NEMIROFSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

WHITING, WILLIAM F.

101 Ygnacio Valley Road Suite 250

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2025
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket5F3F2 CALENDARED ON 05/14/20 IN DEPT. 19. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 05/14/20 IN DEPT. 25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket5F6F2 CALENDARED ON 08/12/20 IN DEPT. 19. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/12/20 IN DEPT. 25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket5F12F2 CALENDARED ON 02/16/21 IN DEPT. 19. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 02/16/21 IN DEPT. 25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket5F18F2 CALENDARED ON 08/12/21 IN DEPT. 19. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/12/21 IN DEPT. 25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket5F5YF2 CALENDARED ON 02/12/25 IN DEPT. 19. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 02/12/25 IN DEPT. 25.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/12/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 2/12/25 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 02/14/2020 OF BEATRICE NEMIROFSKY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/14/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/12/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 2/16/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 19

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.