This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/24/2019 at 21:22:38 (UTC).

BAY ALARM VS BEAUBIEN

Case Summary

On 12/07/2012 BAY ALARM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BEAUBIEN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Concord Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0713

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Concord Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAY ALARM COMPANY

60 Berry Drive

Pacheco, CA 94553

Defendant

WILL BEAUBIEN

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS EXHIBITS RECEIVED FROM PLAINTIFF DEST ROYED PURSUANT TO CCP1952 8/9/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • STAMPED NOTICE SENT W/JUDGMENT CCP1952 RE DESTRUCT ION OF EXHIBITS BY 7/20/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES 05/21/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT WAS MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 05/21/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 05/17/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 12/07/2012 OF BAY ALARM COMPANY AS TO DEF ENDANT WILL BEAUBIEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/01/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • CLERKS`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FOR PAULETTE WEBB FILED AND SIGNED BY PAULETTE WEBB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 1/24/13 AT 13:00 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (MORE THAN 12 CLAIMS FILED WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM - $4,171.49

    Read MoreRead Less