This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 14:52:14 (UTC).

BAXTER,BAILEY & ASSOCIATES VS BARA INFOWARE, ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2018 BAXTER,BAILEY ASSOCIATES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against BARA INFOWARE. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1894

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC.,

15375 Barranca Parkway Suite A-208

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendants

MALENA PRODUCE, INC.,

TOM LANGER COMPANY, INC.,

TOP KATZ BROKERS, LLC,

CLASSIC PRODUCE INC.,

BARA INFOWARE, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRANT, RICHARD L

15375 Barranca Parkway Suite A-208

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, SRV 3 DEFTS, DEFAULT, ENTER JUDGMENT; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT DEPARTMENT CHANGED TO 23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, SRV 3 DEFTS, DEFAULT, ENTER JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED ON THE CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 04/12/2018 OF BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., AGAINST DEFENDANT BARA INFOWARE, INC.,, MALENA PRODUCE, INC.,, TOP KATZ BROKERS, LLC, BY CLERK AS REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketREQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 04/12/2018 OF BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., FILED AS TO BARA INFOWARE, INC.,, MALENA PRODUCE, INC.,, TOP KATZ BROKERS, LLC,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • DocketWE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketWE CANNOT FILE/ISSUE YOUR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 04/12/2018 OF BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., AS TO TOP KATZ BROKERS, LLC,. DATE OF MAILING 05/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL FILED ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 04/12/2018 OF BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., AS TO MALENA PRODUCE, INC.,. DATE OF MAILING 05/29/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketHEARING ON OSC RE: WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE, SRV 3 DEFTS, DEFAULT, ENTER JUDGMENT; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • DocketCLERK'S TICKLER ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CASE - CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE FILED WITHIN 180 DAYS OF FILING COMPLAINT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 04/12/2018 OF BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., AS TO DEFENDANT TOM LANGER COMPANY,INC., WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 04/12/2018 OF BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., RE: BUSINESS BARA INFOWARE, INC., W/MAILING ON 05/07/18 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 04/12/2018 OF BAXTER, BAILEY, & ASSOCIATES, INC., FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE: YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketPLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 10/10/18, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketPLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 4/08/19, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bara Infoware, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BAXTER BAILEY & ASSOCIATES AS ASSIGNEE OF BELA TRUCKING INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANT, RICHARD L.