This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/17/2017 at 01:23:54 (UTC).

BANK OF THE WEST VS. AMERICAN CAPITAL GROUP

Case Summary

On 12/05/2014 BANK OF THE WEST filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN CAPITAL GROUP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0863

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF THE WEST

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AMERICAN CAPITAL GROUP, INC

ALEX ORTHOPAEDICS,LLC

DR PETER SNITOVSKY

ADVANCED ILLINOIS MEDICAL, INC

ROBERT I GOMEZ

PETER SNITOVSKY MD

RIG ENTERPRISES, INC.

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

ALEX ORTHOPAEDICS,LLC

ADVANCED ILLINOIS MEDICAL, INC

RED CORP

PETER SNITOVSKY MD

GRAY MEDICAL, INC

MEDICAL INVENTORY CONTROL CORP

MARIA HERNANDEZ

ROGER I GOMEZ

Lake Villa, IL 60046

BLUE CORP

RIG ENTERPRISES, INC

ELIZABETH GOMEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CEFALU, MARC T.

190 The Embarcadero

San Francisco, CA 94105

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

JOHNSON, JEREMY S

20320 Sw Birch Street Second Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

BLUM, EDWARD L

1600 Shattuck Ave Suite 225

Berkeley, CA 94709

CORTRIGHT, DANIEL G

860 W Spain Street

Sonoma, CA 95476

CROSBY, JAMES D

12750 High Bluff Drive Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE/ 7 DAY(S); Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: ADVANCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2016
  • ISSUE CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY ADVANCED ILLINOIS MEDICAL, INC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY RIG ENTERPRISES, INC; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • HEARING ON OSC RE: ATTY CORTRIGHTS FAIL.TO APPR AT CMC 10-7-15 WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • REQUEST FILED & DISMISSAL ENTERED CROSS COMPLAINT FILED 06/13/2014 OF AMERICAN CAPITAL GROUP, INC AS TO DEFENDANT MEDICAL INVENTORY CONTROL CORP WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2015
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL & PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 06/02/2014
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF BANK OF THE WEST AS TO PETER SNITOVSKY MD WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 05/13/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 6/30/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2014
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF BANK OF THE WEST RE: BUSINESS AMERICAN CAPITAL GROUP, INC W/MAILING ON 05/05/14 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 04/30/2014 OF BANK OF THE WEST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 9/17/14 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • RIG ENTERPRISES, INC. ADDED AS A PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.