Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 05/30/2017 at 13:57:48 (UTC).

BAILEY VS PULTE HOME CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/03/2012 BAILEY filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against PULTE HOME CORPORATION. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0296

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2012

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JUN ZHAI

HERMAN G CUSTODIO

KEVIN T SMITH

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

PULTE HOME CORPORATION

TOWN & COUNTRY ROOFING

Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

COLORIFIC PAINTING

DAGGETT ELECTRIC,INC.

SOUTH VALLEY PLUMBING, INC.

DEGOUGH'S PRECISION DOORS

DAWSON ELECTRIC, INC.

NORMAN MASONRY

CLOVERLEAF CONSTRUCTION CO., INC.

MIDCAL PLASTERING,INC.

TOWN & COUNTRY ROOFING

ACE LATHING, INC.

COAST INSULATION CONTRACTORS

JERRY DELLINGER CONCRETE, INC.

PRODUCTION FRAMINGSYSTEMS, INC.

SAN MARINO PLASTERING, INC.

PETERSEN-DEAN COMMERCIAL, INC.

BRENTWOOD SHEET METAL

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASDAN, KENNETH S

1990 N. California Blvd Suite 1060

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PHILLIPS, KORY L.

6130 Stoneridge Mall Road Ste 275

Pleasanton, CA 94588

Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LEVY, DAVID M.

1600 South Main Plaza, Suite 325

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

PHILLIPS, KORY L.

6130 Stoneridge Mall Road Ste 275

Pleasanton, CA 94588

BLACKWELL, PATRICIA A

1655 Grant Street Suite 800-B

Concord, CA 94520

KENNICK, MICHAEL T.

110 E. Wilshire Avenue Ste. 401

Fullerton, CA 92832

HARRELSON, THOMAS M

533 Airport Blvd Suite 300

Burlingame, CA 94010

EUBANK, BRET W

27710 Jefferson Avenue Suite 102

Temecula, CA 92590

PARK, JULYN M

1230 Oakmead Parkway Suite 306

Sunnyvale, CA 94085

HARRIS, DAVID A

393.0 Civic Center Drive Suite 300

Fremont, CA 94538

Other Attorneys

HAMMONS, WALLACE W

2601 Airport Drive, Suite 105

Torrance, CA 90505

FISCHER, TODD A

888 Munras Ave

Monterey, CA 93940

PETERSON, PATRICIA J

215 Lennon Lane Suite 200

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

BUREK, LAWRENCE M

550 North Parkcenter Drive, Ste 204

Santa Ana, CA 92705

CROWLEY, DANIEL F

3558 Round Barn Blvd Suite 201

Santa Rosa, CA 95403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 34 TO 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY BY PDCI (IMAGE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2014
  • DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM 06 TO 34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2014
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • ELECTRONIC FILING TRANSACTION FEE COLLECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2013
  • NOTICE OF/TO CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY COLORIFIC PAINTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2013
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SHANNON CONNELLY, HERMAN G CUSTODIO, JOHN D MOORE AND, BRENDA JEREZ; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR LEAVE TO FILE 3RD AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SHANNON CONNELLY, JOHN D MOORE AND, BRENDA JEREZ; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
228 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2012 OF GREG BAILEY PAID BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2012
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2012 OF GREG BAILEY FILED BY PULTE HOME CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • COMPLEX LITIGATION DESIGNATION FEE ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2012 OF GREG BAILEY PAID BY GREG A BAILEY, ET AL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/03/2012 OF GREG BAILEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/05/12 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 3/19/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dawson Electric, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTH VALLEY PLUMBING, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PETERSEN-DEAN COMMERCIAL INC is a litigant