Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 11:40:38 (UTC).

BAAP NEAR VS MCQUEEN

Case Summary

On 05/16/2012 BAAP NEAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MCQUEEN. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Walnut Creek Superior Court located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0204

  • Filing Date:

    05/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Walnut Creek Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAAP NEAR, LLC

Defendants

SAMUEL MCQUEEN

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PADILLA, LISA

7676 Hazard Center Dr #900-C

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2013
  • DISMISSAL/JUDGMENT DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DISMISSAL/JUDGMENT DUE ON 8/21/13 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 1CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2012
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE OVER 45 DAYS FROM FILING; Disposition: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • NOTICE OF/TO TRIAL FILED BY BAAP NEAR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: NOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2012
  • COURT TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL SET ON 6/15/12 AT 10:30 IN DEPT. 59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • TRIAL NOTICE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • MEMORANDUM TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED BY BAAP NEAR, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/16/2012 OF BAAP NEAR, LLC AS TO DEF ENDANT SAMUEL MCQUEEN WITH SERVICE DATE OF 05/20/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO SAMUEL MCQUEEN IS GRANTED; Disposition: Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SAMUEL MCQUEEN (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2012
  • ANSWER TO UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/16/2012 OF BAAP NEAR, LLC FILED BY SAMUEL MCQUEEN REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • SET FOR TRACKING UD CASE ON 7/02/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT 1CLK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON UD COMPLAINT FILED 05/16/2012 OF BAAP NEAR, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED (UP TO $10,000). SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PADILLA, LISA