This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 14:13:18 (UTC).

AVILA VS ROJERO

Case Summary

On 02/17/2017 AVILA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ROJERO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0335

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EMELY AVILA

Defendant

OSCAR M ROJERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAGNER, ERIC R

3260 Blume Drive Suite 110

Richmond, CA 94806

Defendant Attorney

HEATH, STEPHEN B

268 Bush Street #3006

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2017
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2017
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • PLACED ON CLERK`S CALENDAR FOR 9/07/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF/TO UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT FILED BY EMELY AVILA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY EMELY AVILA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: NOT HEARD/CONT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • (U.J.) ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2017 OF EMELY AVILA FILED BY OSCAR M ROJERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • REFUND MISCELLANEOUS TRUST

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/06/2017
  • OVERPAYMENT IN EXCESS OF $10.00 RECEIVED FROM ERIC WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • RECEIPT FOR OVERPAYMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • FEE RECEIVED FOR EX PARTE APP & ORDER FOR EXT. OF TIME TO SERVE BY ERIC WAGNER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 7/11/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/27/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/17/2017 OF EMELY AVILA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.