Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/31/2017 at 10:40:58 (UTC).

AUTO TEK REPAIR VS RUIZ

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 AUTO TEK REPAIR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0434

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pittsburg Superior Court - Richard E Arnason Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

AUTO TEK REPAIR

2201 A Street

Antioch, CA 94509

Defendant and Appellant

ARTURO RUIZ

Pittsburg, CA 94565

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2013
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/24/2012 OF AUTO TEK REPAIR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING OF NTC OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL SENT TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/25/12 SET ASIDE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • JUDGMENT AFTER TRIAL DE NOVO ON APPEAL FROM SUPERIOR COURT ENTERED ON 09/18/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • TRIAL DE NOVO ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • HEARING ON TRIAL DE NOVO/SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL WAS SET FOR 9/18/12 AT 13:30 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FROM THE JUDGMENT FILED BY CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 05/24/2012 OF AUTO TEK REPAIR ARTURO RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 07/25/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 07/25/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2012
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: SUBMITTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • A SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 7/10/12 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 57

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GREY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (CLAIM GREATER THAN $5,000.00, UP TO $10,000.00 - BY NATURAL PERSONS ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2012
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM: $7,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less