This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 20:24:08 (UTC).

ATHWAL V LEISURE HOTEL GROUP

Case Summary

On 08/22/2014 ATHWAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against LEISURE HOTEL GROUP. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1594

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BALJINDER PAL ATHWAL

Defendants

LEISURE HOTEL GROUP, LLC

JASBIR S GILL

SURINDER S GILL

KULWINDER S BADH

RUPINDER S GILL

GURMAIL SINGH GILL

MANJEET KAUR SANDHU

Other

DONAHUE FITZGERALDLLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROGERSON, COURTNEY J

50 West Fernando Street

San Jose, CA 95113

BUDDE, DENAE HILDEBRAND

2033 N Main Street Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

ROSENBLUTH, ELLEN P

2033 N Main Street, Suite 750

Walnut Creek, CA 94596

Defendant Attorney

HAMANT, CANDICE N

One Embarcadero Center Suite 2860

San Francisco, CA 94111

Other Attorney

HANDLER, ERIC A.

1999 Harrison Street 25Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2019
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • CHECK FOR DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • ORDER TO DESTROY EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING RE: NOTICE TO DESTROY EXHIBITS SENT TO BALJINDER PAL ATHWAL, LEISURE HOTEL GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • NOTICE TO DESTROY EXHIBITS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • HEARING ON SPECIAL SET ( PROPERTY VALUATION); Disposition: COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR BE RELIVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY BALJINDER PAL ATHWAL; Disposition: ADVANCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • PLAINTIFF BALJINDER PAL ATHWALS BUYOUT STATUS UPDATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • HEARING ON MOTION TO/FOR BE RELIVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY BALJINDER PAL ATHWAL; Disposition: DROPPED BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
327 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2014
  • CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 11/19/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • (U.J.) 1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF BALJINDER ATHWAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/22/2014 OF BALJINDER ATHWAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • COLOR OF FILE IS GOLD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/08/15 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/27/14 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2014
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 31

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.