Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/14/2017 at 21:07:44 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE VS. MYRNA MCCAULEY

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 ASSET ACCEPTANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MYRNA MCCAULEY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5922

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

MYRNA M MCCAULEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MERRILL, ANN K

GRAVES, MISHAELA J.

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • RETURN WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 01/09/15 TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED. RETURNED NOT SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $15,372.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,626.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • DATE MAILED: 12/08/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,412.19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • DATE MAILED: 12/23/14

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2012
  • 5CDJC2 CALENDARED ON 08/19/13 IN DEPT. 17. HAS BEEN UPDATED TO 08/19/13 IN DEPT. 09.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2012
  • PROOF OF SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC AS TO MYRNA M MCCAULEY WITH DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE AND DECLARATION OF MAILING ON 09/28/12 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 8/19/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF MERRILL FILED RE: PURS TO CCP 395(B); VENUE FOR PERSONAL, FAMILY OR HOUSEHOLD OBLIGATIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON CONSUMER CREDIT COLLECTIONS CMPL (CRC 3.740) FILED 08/23/2012 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE: RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • PLACED ON CLERK'S TICKLER CALENDAR FOR 2/22/13, AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED; SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 17

    Read MoreRead Less