Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/01/2017 at 01:00:14 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE VS GREGORY

Case Summary

On 08/23/2012 ASSET ACCEPTANCE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GREGORY. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2055

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER GREGORY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MERRILL, ANN K

GRAVES, MISHAELA J.

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2017
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: CHECK RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2014
  • CORRESPONDENCE MEMO RE: WRIT OF EXECUTION (MONEY JUDGMENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2014
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED. ANN K MERRILL SUBSTITUTES OUT AS ATTORNEY FOR ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC AND IS REPLACED BY MISHAELA J. GRAVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,288.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2013
  • CHECK FOR JUDGMENT PACKET; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 03/05/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • ORDER FOR JUDGMENT ENTERED IN AMOUNT $29,469.04 COURT ACCEPTS CPIES IN LIEU OF ORG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2013
  • JUDGMENT FILED/ENTERED-BEFORE TRIAL ON 03/05/13

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/04/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT WAS SET FOR 10/19/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2012
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC AS TO CHRISTOPHER GREGORY WITH SERVICE DATE OF 08/30/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 1/10/13 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 10/29/12 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • DECLARATION OF ANN K. MERRILL FILED RE: VENUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 08/23/2012 OF ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COLOR OF FILE IS RED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less