This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 02/15/2020 at 12:23:47 (UTC).

ASHA KOTNANA VS SRINIVASA RAO KANCHADAPU

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 ASHA KOTNANA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SRINIVASA RAO KANCHADAPU. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0795

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ASHA KOTNANA

Concord, CA 94518

Respondent

SRINIVASA RAO KANCHADAPU

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2025
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/14/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/12/20 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 2/16/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/12/21 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 2/12/25 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCOLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • Docket(FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITHOUT CHILDREN FILED 02/14/2020 OF ASHA KOTNANA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 29

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.