This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 07/21/2017 at 11:58:31 (UTC).

APOYO VS. DE LOS SANTOS

Case Summary

On 10/28/2015 APOYO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DE LOS SANTOS. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0562

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APOYO FINANCIERO, INC.

13901 San Pablo Ave

San Pablo, CA 94806

Defendant

JUAN PABLO DE LOS SANTOS

El Sobrante, CA 94803

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 10/28/2015 OF APOYO FINANCIERO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2016
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 01/25/16 TO ALAMEDA COUNTY FILED. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $3,188.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: UD NOTICE NOT DELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • RETURNED MAIL: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT NOT DELIVERABLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ALAMEDA COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,835.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF CREDITS FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED IN AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS FILED IN AMOUNT OF $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2016
  • MEMO OF COSTS ACCRUED MAILED ON 01/20/16

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 12/11/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2015
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 10/28/2015 OF APOYO FINANCIERO, INC. AS TO JUAN PABLO DE LOS SANTOS FILED. DATE OF MAILING 11/05/15. FEE FOR SERVICE $110.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (MORE THAN 12 CLAIMS FILED WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 12/11/15 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2015
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APOYO FINANCIERO INC is a litigant