This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 04/25/2019 at 09:49:48 (UTC).

APOYO FINANCIERO VS MARINEZ

Case Summary

On 09/26/2016 APOYO FINANCIERO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MARINEZ. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0474

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Richmond Superior Court - George D Carroll Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APOYO FINANCIERO INC

13901 San Pablo Ave

San Pablo, CA 94806

Defendant

GERARDO OROZCO MARTINEZ

San Pablo, CA 94806

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2017
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/26/2016 OF APOYO FINANCIERO INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • SET JUDGMENT STATUS 0002 SATISFIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • RETURNED WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ON 07/17/17 TO MARIN COUNTY FILED. RETURNED FULLY SATISFIED. IF PARTIAL, SUM OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO MARIN COUNTY IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,852.69

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF ACCRUED COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT FILED. $0.00 CREDITS, $27.69 INTEREST AND $200.00 COSTS. MAILED ON 01/10/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES ON 12/07/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT ENTERED BY DEFAULT ON 12/02/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • ARCELIA SANCHEZ AUTHORIZED TO APPEAR FOR APOYO FINANCIERO FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • MARTHA ALEJANDRE AUTHORIZED TO APPEAR FOR APOYO FINANCIERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: ORDERED I

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • SUBSTITUTE PROOF OF SERVICE ON CLAIM OF PLTF FILED 09/26/2016 OF APOYO FINANCIERO INC AS TO GERARDO OROZCO MARTINEZ FILED. DATE OF MAILING 11/03/16. FEE FOR SERVICE $125.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL; Disposition: Continued - Not Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • COLOR OF FILE IS PINK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FOR PERSONAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED (MORE THAN 12 CLAIMS FILED WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • AMOUNT OF CLAIM $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL WAS SET FOR 11/02/16 AT 13:15 IN DEPT. 54

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APOYO FINANCIERO INC is a litigant