This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 06/09/2018 at 12:03:24 (UTC).

APHRODITE NTSAME VS CEDRIC SANDJO

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 APHRODITE NTSAME filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CEDRIC SANDJO. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2436

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

APHRODITE NTSAME

Oakland, CA 94611

Respondent

CEDRIC SANDJO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2023
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS (DISMISSAL, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS (JUDGMENT OR CASE STATUS STATEMENT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 6 MONTHS (RESPONSE OR DEFAULT, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS (PROOF OF SERVICE, PURSUANT TO CRC 5.83)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • HRG ON F/L MTN/OSC TO/FOR CHILD CUSTODY, C/V, C/S, S/S, MED/CHILD CARE ( APHRODITE NTSAME)(PRO PER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 12 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 5/28/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 18 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 11/21/19 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 5 YEARS WAS SET FOR 5/24/23 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • CLERK TICKLER TO CHECK CASE STATUS AT 3 MONTHS WAS SET FOR 8/23/18 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2018
  • HEARING ON MOTION WAS SET FOR 7/25/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FAMILY LAW REQUEST FOR ORDERS RE: CHILD CUSTODY, C/V, C/S, S/S, MED/CHILD CARE, FILED BY: APHRODITE NTSAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • COLOR OF FILE (FAMILY LAW): GOLDEN ROD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • (FAMILY LAW) SUMMONS ON DISSOLUTION WITH CHILDREN FILED 05/25/2018 OF APHRODITE NTSAME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY APHRODITE NTSAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY APHRODITE NTSAME (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER AS TO APHRODITE NTSAME IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 22

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.