This case was last updated from Contra Costa County Superior Courts on 01/06/2019 at 20:50:36 (UTC).

STADIE VS JOHN MUIR

Case Summary

On 02/01/2017 STADIE filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against JOHN MUIR. This case was filed in Contra Costa County Superior Courts, Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse located in Contra Costa, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0202

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Contra Costa County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Martinez Superior Court - Wakefield Taylor Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Contra Costa, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLY STADIE

ANNETTE STADIE

Defendants

JOHN MUIR HEALTH

JOHN MUIR MEDICAL CENTER

COSETTE PARRA, R.N.

CROSS-COUNTRY STAFFING, INC.

COSETTE PARA R.N

CROSS COUNTRY HEALTHCARE INC

STABILITY HEALTHCARE, INC

HEATHER ZEH R.N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERSH, NANCY

601 Van Ness Ave Suite 2080

San Francisco, CA 94102-6396

Defendant Attorneys

GALLOWAY, ESQ., G. PATRICK

2300 Contra Costa Blvd. Suite 350

Pleasant Hill, CA 94523

ZENERE, JAMES J

1033 Willow Street

San Jose, CA 95125

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/17/18 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • REQUEST FILED AND DISMISSAL ENTERED WITH PREJUDICEAS TO ENTIRE ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY COSETTE PARRA, R.N., CROSS COUNTRY HEALTHCARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN MUIR HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Disposition: Complete

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHN MUIR HEALTH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY ANNETTE STADIE, WILLY STADIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY COSETTE PARRA, R.N., CROSS COUNTRY HEALTHCARE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2017
  • PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2017 OF ANNETTE STADIE AS TO JOHN MUIR HEALTH WITH SERVICE DATE OF 02/16/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • IDENTIFIED OVERAGE RECEIVED FROM OVER THE AMT FOR COPIES BY $2.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • CLERK`S TICKLER TO CHECK FOR PROOF OF SERVICE WAS SET FOR 4/07/17 AT 7:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • CASE ENTRY COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • ORIGINAL SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FILED 02/01/2017 OF ANNETTE STADIE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • COLOR OF FILE IS YELLOW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE WAS SET FOR 6/21/17 AT 9:00 IN DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • CASE HAS BEEN ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED. SUMMONS IS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.